Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jérôme Cardinal Souchier, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1508Born
24 Mar 156860.2Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jan 156961.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
10 Nov 157163.8DiedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana

MicroData Summary for Jérôme Souchier
Jérôme Cardinal Souchier O. Cist. (born 1508, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAuvergne, France

  • a cardinal for 3.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Mar 1568

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018