Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Sorrentino

Deceased

Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1640Born
21 Dec 167030.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 167332.4AppointedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
16 Apr 167332.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
27 Apr 167635.5AppointedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
Sep 1708³67.9DiedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Sorrentino
Bishop Domenico Sorrentino (born , died Sep 1708) Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCava

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 336, and Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018