Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bawai (Ashur) Soro

Bishop of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1954 Born
7 Jan 197318.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Feb 198227.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 198430.6Ordained BishopBishop
11 May 200854.1Converted
11 Jan 201459.8AppointedOfficial of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego (Chaldean), USA
11 Jan 201459.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Foratiana
31 Oct 201763.6AppointedBishop of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean), Canada
29 Nov 201763.7InstalledBishop of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean), Canada

MicroData Summary for Bawai (Ashur) Soro (VIAF: 48746927)
Bishop Bawai (Ashur) Soro (born ) Bishop of Mar Addai of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKerkūk, Iraq

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2014
  • b: CB, 11 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,064
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2017
  • i: CB, 11 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 11 Nov 2017