Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Santacroce

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia, Italy

Apostolic Nuncio to Emperor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542¹Born
18 Jul 157634.5AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
Sep 1576³34.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
29 Jun 157735.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
15 Sep 158038.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
15 Jun 158139.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
3 Sep 158139.6DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Santacroce (VIAF: 296345932)
Bishop Ottavio Santacroce (born 1542, died ) Bishop of Cervia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Laurent, Cathedral, Perugia, Diocese of Perugia

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 163
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Jan 2014
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018