Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Smyth (Smith)

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1460BornFarnworth
1 Oct 149232.8AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
3 Feb 149333.1Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
6 Nov 149535.8AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
2 Jan 151454.0DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Smyth (Smith):
Bishop William Smyth (Smith) (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 554
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 135, and Page 177
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 225
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013