Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Andrew Small, O.M.I.

Secretary of the Pontifical Commission for the Protection of Minors

Note(s): (pro tempore)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1968 Born
1991²22.6First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1997²28.6Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
13 Jun 199931.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
22 Jun 202153.1AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for the Protection of Minors

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrew Small
Father Andrew Small O.M.I. (born ) Secretary of Protection of Minors

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEverton, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestSt Teresa of the Child Jesus, Church, Norris Green, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

Please contact the Father through the Pontifical Commission for the Protection of Minors.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2021
  • b: CB, 22 Jun 2021
  • op/c1/loc: AJ, 15 Aug 2022
  • bpp: CL, 22 Oct 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 22 Oct 2022