Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Bogoria Skotnicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Titular Bishop of Lycopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1653¹Born
1 Oct 168532.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Oct 168532.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
13 Jan 168633.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
10 Dec 170047.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Bogoria Skotnicki
Bishop Tomasz Bogoria Skotnicki (born 1653, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast