Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Kazimierz Opaliński, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1639Born
165920.0Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
25 Apr 166223.3ProfessedPriest of Order of Cistercians
8 Jan 168041.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Poznań, Poland
8 Jan 168041.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletiana
24 Mar 168041.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocletiana
23 Jun 168142.4SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
17 Nov 168142.8ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
13 Mar 168243.1InstalledBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
22 Jul 169354.5DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Kazimierz Opaliński
Bishop Jan Kazimierz Opaliński O. Cist. (born 1639, died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalisz

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,233
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast