Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim Skirmunt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

Titular Bishop of Utica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹Born
8 Aug 170167.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
8 Aug 170167.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
9 Apr 170268.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
5 Dec 171884.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Joachim Skirmunt:
Bishop Joachim Skirmunt (born 1634, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015