Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristoforo Sizzo de Noris

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1706Born
24 May 173326.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trento, Italy
30 May 173326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
22 Aug 176357.0AppointedBishop of Trento, Italy
21 Dec 176357.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
16 Mar 177669.5DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Sizzo de Noris
Bishop Cristoforo Sizzo de Noris (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrento

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018