Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Simões Brandão

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1672³BornCoimbra, Portugal
19 Mar 169523.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Jun 169624.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 170229.9AppointedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
24 Sep 170230.5Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
24 Feb 172047.9ResignedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
30 Mar 173361.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo, Angola

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Simões Brandão:
Bishop Luis Simões Brandão (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 169
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015