Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Silvestri

Deceased

Bishop of Firenze, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1318¹AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
30 Apr 1318Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
25 May 1321AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
15 Mar 1323AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
21 Oct 1341DiedBishop of Firenze, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Silvestri
Bishop Francesco Silvestri (died ) Bishop of Firenze

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 447, and Page 107
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 250
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,828

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast