Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vladislaus Silnicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Feb 1683AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
15 Feb 1683AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
14 Nov 1683Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
8 Feb 1692DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Vladislaus Silnicki:
Bishop Vladislaus Silnicki (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 375
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015