Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Sherborne

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chichester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1442¹Born
5 Jan 150563.0AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
11 May 150563.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
18 Sep 150866.7AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
153694.0ResignedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
21 Aug 153694.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Chichester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Sherborne (VIAF: 31798782)
Bishop Robert Sherborne (born 1442, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chichester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRolleston-on-Dove

  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 248, and Page 300
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 167, and Page 241
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 96
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1505, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast