Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Athanasiy Sheptyskyi

Deceased

Archbishop of Foreign Archdiocese

Note/Previous Titular See: (Kyiv des ukrainiens)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1686¹BornVoshchatychi
1715¹29.0AppointedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
13 Sep 171529.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
17 Aug 172943.6AppointedArchbishop of Foreign Archdiocese
12 Dec 174660.9DiedArchbishop of Foreign Archdiocese

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Athanasiy Sheptyskyi:
Archbishop Athanasiy Sheptyskyi (died ) Archbishop of Foreign Archdiocese

  • a bishop for 31.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,533

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013