Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Saint-Gelais

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Uzés, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jun 1529AppointedBishop of Uzés, France
Nov 1531³Ordained BishopBishop of Uzés, France
11 Dec 1566ResignedBishop of Uzés, France
13 Mar 1574DiedBishop Emeritus of Uzés, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Saint-Gelais
Bishop Jean de Saint-Gelais (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Uzés

  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 324
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,531, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast