Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Le Veneur

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lisieux, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1505AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
24 Aug 1505Ordained BishopBishop of Lisieux, France
7 Nov 1533Elevated to Cardinal
10 Nov 1533InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
18 Aug 1539ResignedBishop of Lisieux, France
7 Aug 1543DiedBishop Emeritus of Lisieux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Le Veneur (VIAF: 283759784)
Jean Cardinal Le Veneur (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lisieux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNormandy
Ordained BishopDominican, Church, Lisieux, Diocese of Lisieux
Death PlaceMarle
Buried Place (Original)Sanit-Andre d'Appeville, Church

  • a bishop for 37.9 years
  • a cardinal for 9.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Nov 1533
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 224
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1505, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast