Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Seignelay

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Feb 1207AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
27 Apr 1220AppointedBishop of Paris, France
23 Nov 1223DiedBishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Seignelay
Bishop Guillaume de Seignelay (died ) Bishop of Paris

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 119, and Page 391
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 10,981

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast