Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Cesare Segni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rieti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1584AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
7 Oct 1584Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 1584Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
16 Jun 1603ResignedBishop of Rieti, Italy
27 Mar 1621DiedBishop Emeritus of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Cesare Segni
Bishop Giulio Cesare Segni (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rieti

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Michel Leproseca, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Death PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast