Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fabio Mirto Frangipani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caiazzo

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

Apostolic Nuncio to France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1514¹BornCaiazzo
10 Jul 153723.5AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
12 Aug 156854.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
11 Jun 157258.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
5 Nov 157258.8ResignedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
5 Nov 157258.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
14 Jun 158672.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
17 Mar 158773.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Caiazzo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabio Mirto Frangipani (VIAF: 46797479)
Archbishop Fabio Mirto Frangipani (born 1514, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caiazzo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 254
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016