Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Segna

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1836BornPoggio Ginolfo, Italy
20 Dec 186024.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 189154.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
18 May 189457.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 189457.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
4 Jul 189659.8AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
13 Jan 190871.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
4 Jan 191174.3DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index

MicroData Summary for Francesco Segna:
Cardinal Francesco Segna (born , died ) Prefect of Index

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a cardinal for 16.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1894

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013