Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Epifanio Scianow

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Macedonia (Thessalonika) (Bulgarian)

Titular Bishop of Livias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1849Born
1873¹23.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 189545.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Macedonia (Thessalonika) (Bulgarian)
23 Jul 189545.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Livias
8 Sep 189545.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Livias
1922¹72.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Macedonia (Thessalonika) (Bulgarian)
17 Feb 194090.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Macedonia (Thessalonika) (Bulgarian)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Epifanio Scianow
Bishop Epifanio Scianow (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Macedonia (Thessalonika)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKazanlik
Ordained BishopSt. Benoit, Constantinople

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 347
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast