Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stanislao Cardinal Sanseverino

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1764BornNaples, Italy
8 Mar 181651.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
22 Jul 181652.0Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jul 181652.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
21 Mar 182560.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
11 May 182661.8DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Stanislao Sanseverino:
Stanislao Cardinal Sanseverino (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 10.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015