Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Leonardo Sanna

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1680³BornCuleri
3 Mar 170322.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Feb 170423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bosa, Italy
26 Sep 173656.3AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
28 Apr 173756.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
1 May 173756.9SelectedBishop of Bosa, Italy
30 Sep 173757.3ConfirmedBishop of Bosa, Italy
Oct 1741³61.3DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Leonardo Sanna:
Bishop Giovanni Leonardo Sanna (born ) Bishop of Bosa

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1740
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 95
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 80, and Page 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013