Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Costantino Falletti

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1675BornTaurinen
4 Oct 170530.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 172651.6AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
16 Feb 172751.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
1 Jan 174872.6DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Costantino Falletti:
Archbishop Giovanni Costantino Falletti (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014