Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Sánchez, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Urgell

Titular Bishop of Hippos


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Oct 1478AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Urgell, Spain
14 Oct 1478AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
1 Nov 1478Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
25 Mar 1487DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Urgell, Spain

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Sánchez:
Bishop Bernardino Sánchez O.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Urgell

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 165
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,372
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 310, Number 200
  • d: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015