Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakub von Salza

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1481³Born
1 Sep 152039.0SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
24 Jul 152139.9ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
17 Nov 152140.2Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
25 Aug 153958.0DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakub von Salza
Bishop Jakub von Salza (born Aug 1481, died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePisarzowicach
Ordained BishopBreslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,771
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1521, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jun 2018

Quantcast