Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simone Saltarelli, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Sep 1316AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
3 Oct 1316Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
6 Jun 1323AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
24 Sep 1342DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simone Saltarelli
Archbishop Simone Saltarelli O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 392, and Page 400
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,707

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 16 Dec 2020

Quantcast