Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Antonio Cardinal Sala

Deceased

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1762Born
10 Mar 182360.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
1825²62.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Council
30 Sep 183168.9Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 183168.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
21 Mar 183471.4AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
11 Dec 183876.1AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
23 Jun 183976.6DiedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Sala (VIAF: 61931453)
Giuseppe Antonio Cardinal Sala (born , died ) Prefect of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 7.7 years

Source(s):
  • x933: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast