Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo de São Caetano, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1718¹BornLisboa, Portugal
28 Jul 175840.5SelectedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
28 May 175941.4ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
4 Nov 178062.8DiedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de São Caetano:
Bishop Bernardo de São Caetano O.S.A. (born 1718, died ) Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 48
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015