Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop ═˝igo (Ignacio) Royo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin

Archbishop (Personal Title) of Barbastro


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jul 1660AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
17 Nov 1670AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Albarracin, Spain
25 Sep 1673AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Barbastro, Spain
14 Jun 1680DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

MicroData Summary for ═˝igo (Ignacio) Royo:
Archbishop ═˝igo (Ignacio) Royo O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Albarracin

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 74, and Page 113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 350
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 192, Number 1,208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013