Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Rotwicz, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cantanus


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1346AppointedTitular Bishop of Cantanus
22 Nov 1346Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cantanus
18 Oct 1374DiedTitular Bishop of Cantanus

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Rotwicz
Bishop Franciszek Rotwicz O.F.M. (died ) Titular Bishop of Cantanus

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 163
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,915

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast