Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giulio Rossino

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540¹Born
28 Mar 157636.2AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
2 Jun 158545.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Jul 1587³47.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
9 Jan 161676.0DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Rossino (VIAF: 257483979)
Archbishop Giulio Rossino (born 1540, died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacerata

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 106
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 283
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018