Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco D’Afflitto

Deceased

Bishop of Scala, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1583AppointedBishop of Scala, Italy
13 Nov 1583Ordained BishopBishop of Scala, Italy
11 Oct 1593DiedBishop of Scala, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco D’Afflitto
Bishop Francesco D’Afflitto (died ) Bishop of Scala

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Amalfi, Archdiocese of Amalfi

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,825
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1583, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018