Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Rokitnicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Titular Bishop of Alalis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1701³Born
26 Nov 176463.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
26 Nov 176463.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Alalis
30 Dec 176463.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alalis
17 Jan 177977.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Rokitnicki
Bishop Kazimierz Rokitnicki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsiek

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 71, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018