Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximilian Augustinus Christoph von Rodt

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1717BornKehl
177557.1SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
15 Apr 177658.3ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
12 Aug 177658.7Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
17 Jan 180082.1DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Maximilian Augustinus Christoph von Rodt:
Bishop Maximilian Augustinus Christoph von Rodt (born , died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a bishop for 23.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013