Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Nepomuk Augustin von Hornstein zu Hohenstoffen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1730³Born
8 Jun 176736.9Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
16 May 176837.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
16 May 176837.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
26 Jun 176838.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
20 Feb 177948.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
16 Dec 180575.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Nepomuk Augustin von Hornstein zu Hohenstoffen
Bishop Johann Nepomuk Augustin von Hornstein zu Hohenstoffen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeiterdingen, Diocese of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1768, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 209, and Page 452
  • ob: CB, 22 Dec 2019
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast