Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mauro Rivella

Secretary Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

Priest of Torino {Turin}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1963 Born
22 May 198824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
14 Apr 201551.7AppointedSecretary of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
15 Jun 202056.8ResignedSecretary of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Mauro Rivella (VIAF: 234909856)
Father Mauro Rivella (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoncalieri, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Please contact the Father through the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2015
  • c1/loc: AM, 2 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Jun 2020

Quantcast