Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geraldo de Requeséns

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Feb 1387AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
10 Jul 1387Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
13 Feb 1399DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Geraldo de Requeséns
Bishop Geraldo de Requeséns (died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,444
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 283
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,985

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018