Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Garsías Fernández de Heredia

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1377AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
7 Oct 1383AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
1 Jul 1411DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Garsías Fernández de Heredia:
Archbishop Garsías Fernández de Heredia (died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 153, and Page 526

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 24 Jan 2014