Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cesare Maria Antonio Cardinal Rasponi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615BornRavenna, Italy
14 Jan 166449.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Feb 166651.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Mar 166651.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
21 Nov 167560.8DiedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

MicroData Summary for Cesare Maria Antonio Rasponi:
Cesare Maria Antonio Cardinal Rasponi (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

  • a cardinal for 11.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015