Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Ilarione Cardinal Randi

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1818BornBegnacavallo, Italy
15 Mar 187556.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
17 Sep 187557.2Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 187557.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
24 Mar 188465.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
20 Dec 188769.4DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Ilarione Randi:
Cardinal Lorenzo Ilarione Randi (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 12.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54, and Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013