Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolás de Ramos y Santos, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1531Born
12 Feb 158856.1AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
4 May 158856.4InstalledBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
13 Jul 159260.6AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
1 Dec 159967.9DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Nicolás de Ramos y Santos
Archbishop Nicolás de Ramos y Santos O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillasabariego, Diocese of León, Spain
Death PlaceSanto Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 278, and Page 187
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 101, Number 636
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 176
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 5*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018