Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Rae

Deceased

Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1339AppointedBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Feb 1339Ordained BishopBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
27 Jan 1367DiedBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Rae
Bishop William Rae (died ) Bishop of Glasgow

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 264
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 240
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,827

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast