Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Michele Radicati, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alghero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1719BornSaluzzo
2 Sep 174222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Jun 177252.7SelectedBishop of Alghero, Italy
7 Sep 177252.9ConfirmedBishop of Alghero, Italy
11 Oct 177253.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
19 May 179373.6DiedBishop of Alghero, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Michele Radicati:
Bishop Gioacchino Michele Radicati O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Alghero

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 76
  • ob: CB, 17 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014