Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean Pradelle

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Bayeux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1745Born
23 Dec 176924.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181772.1SelectedBishop of Bayeux, France
1 Oct 181772.2ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux, France
2 Apr 181872.7DiedBishop-Elect of Bayeux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Pradelle
Father Jean Pradelle (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Bayeux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGagnac

  • a priest for 48.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 102
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast