Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Power

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Apr 1582AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
13 May 1582Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
15 Dec 1587DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Peter Power
Bishop Peter Power (died ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1582, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018