Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giuseppe Potier, C.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Arauca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1873BornVille-Lizon, France
4 Jun 189925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
7 May 192450.6AppointedPrefect of Arauca, Colombia
195076.3DiedPrefect of Arauca, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Potier:
Father Giuseppe Potier C.M. (born ) Prefect of Arauca

  • a priest for 50.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015