Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Portico

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1520Born
18 Feb 156847.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
1 Jun 157353.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
9 Mar 157555.0AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
Jul 1579³59.3ResignedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
13 Aug 158363.4AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
6 Sep 158666.5ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1590²69.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Portico (VIAF: 62721260)
Archbishop Vincenzo Portico (born , died 1590) Archbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 281
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 280
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 8*
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast