Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco (Martinez) Polanco (López de Lorena)

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1717Born
13 Nov 177558.5AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
1 Sep 177659.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
20 Nov 178467.6DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for Francisco (Martinez) Polanco (López de Lorena)
Bishop Francisco (Martinez) Polanco (López de Lorena) (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCianca y Parvayón, Spain

  • a bishop for 8.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,475
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 93, Number 478
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 56
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast